TX HB3475 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care information provided by and notice of facility fees charged by certain freestanding emergency medical care facilities.
Title
Relating to health care information provided by and notice of facility fees charged by certain freestanding emergency medical care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-11 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES