TX HB3472 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the investment and use of excess residential mortgage loan originator recovery fund fees and to the creation of the mortgage grant fund; changing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the investment and use of excess residential mortgage loan originator recovery fund fees and to the creation of the mortgage grant fund; changing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-14HouseAmended 1-Deshotel
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-07HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1791 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback