TX HB3459 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#492 (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#492
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-18HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2022 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback