TX HB3452 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to granting limited state law enforcement authority to certain federal special agents.
Title
Relating to granting limited state law enforcement authority to certain federal special agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1628 (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1628 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |