TX HB3451 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-46)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the study and approval of lethal pesticides for feral hog control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the study and approval of lethal pesticides for feral hog control.

Sponsors

Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]

Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#261 (Y: 127 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#257 (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-04-24SenateRead first time
2017-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18HouseRecord vote
2017-04-18HousePassed
2017-04-18HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-17HouseRecord vote
2017-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-17HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-04-13HousePostponed
2017-04-13HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-04-12HousePostponed
2017-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback