TX HB3444 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 907 in Hidalgo County as the Santa Ana National Wildlife Trail.
Title
Relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 907 in Hidalgo County as the Santa Ana National Wildlife Trail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3444 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03444I.htm |