TX HB3441 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reimbursement under certain health benefit plans for certain services and procedures performed by pharmacists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reimbursement under certain health benefit plans for certain services and procedures performed by pharmacists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#752
2019-04-26HousePassed
2019-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2284 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback