TX HB3441 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reimbursement under certain health benefit plans for certain services and procedures performed by pharmacists.
Title
Relating to reimbursement under certain health benefit plans for certain services and procedures performed by pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2284 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS