TX HB3439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a municipality or county to require a labor peace agreement as a condition of engaging in a commercial transaction with the municipality or county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a municipality or county to require a labor peace agreement as a condition of engaging in a commercial transaction with the municipality or county.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HousePostponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 4:00 PM
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 3:30 PM
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1634 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback