TX HB3423 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to organization of, meetings of, and voting by condominium unit owners' associations and property owners' associations.
Title
Relating to organization of, meetings of, and voting by condominium unit owners' associations and property owners' associations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bryant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1767 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1767 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1767 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
Business & Commerce--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property