TX HB3414 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to alternative equal access times of possession under a standard possession order in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alternative equal access times of possession under a standard possession order in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback