TX HB3409 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for training regarding trauma for judges, prosecuting attorneys, correctional officers, and law enforcement officers.
Title
Relating to requirements for training regarding trauma for judges, prosecuting attorneys, correctional officers, and law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING