TX HB339 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter registration application forms in high schools.
Title
Relating to voter registration application forms in high schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Elections
HB1071 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Elections
SB636 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to State Affairs
HB1071 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Elections
SB636 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
SECRETARY OF STATE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
SECRETARY OF STATE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB339 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00339I.htm |