TX HB3387 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorization for certain land applications and disposal of dairy waste.
Title
Relating to the authorization for certain land applications and disposal of dairy waste.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--General
MILK
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--General
MILK
WATER
Water--General