TX HB3387 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sex offender treatment as a condition of parole or mandatory supervision for certain releasees.
Title
Relating to sex offender treatment as a condition of parole or mandatory supervision for certain releasees.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 3387Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 3387Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 3387Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
SEXUAL OFFENDERS