TX HB3385 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing the oyster advisory committee of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to establishing the oyster advisory committee of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Leo-Wilson [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Rep. Josey Garcia [D] | Rep. Stan Kitzman [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1392 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
SB1392 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
SB1392 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Subjects
OYSTER COUNCIL
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset—Required Reviews
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset—Required Reviews