TX HB3378 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an advisory body on the security of the electric grid.
Title
Relating to an advisory body on the security of the electric grid.
Sponsors
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
ELECTRIC GRID SECURITY COUNCIL, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
ELECTRIC GRID SECURITY COUNCIL, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric