TX HB3376 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to expanding eligibility for medical assistance to certain persons under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and ensuring the provision of quality care under and the effectiveness of the medical assistance program.
Title
Relating to expanding eligibility for medical assistance to certain persons under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and ensuring the provision of quality care under and the effectiveness of the medical assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3376 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03376I.htm |