TX HB3376 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1794 (Same As) 2009-03-20 - Referred to Health & Human Services