TX HB3372 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1988 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback