TX HB3360 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil actions by a civilly committed individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil actions by a civilly committed individual.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#545 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#545
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB908 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback