TX HB3350 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from length limitations for certain vehicles or combinations of vehicles used to transport harvest machines.
Title
Relating to an exemption from length limitations for certain vehicles or combinations of vehicles used to transport harvest machines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |