TX HB335 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the posting of certain notices for political subdivisions on the comptroller's Internet website.
Title
Relating to the posting of certain notices for political subdivisions on the comptroller's Internet website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Technology |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous