TX HB3348 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the number of baccalaureate degree programs certain public junior colleges may offer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the number of baccalaureate degree programs certain public junior colleges may offer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#341 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#341
2021-04-20HousePassed
2021-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-19HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1300 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Co-author authorized
SB1300 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3348
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03348I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03348H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03348E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03348S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03348F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03348I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03348H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03348H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03348E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03348E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3348&RcdVtNo=341&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=78
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=79

Bill Comments

feedback