TX HB3346 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an indicator of achievement for evaluating the performance of public elementary, middle school, and junior high campuses and districts under the public school accountability system.
Title
Relating to an indicator of achievement for evaluating the performance of public elementary, middle school, and junior high campuses and districts under the public school accountability system.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts