TX HB3337 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training and education for state agency administrators and employees.
Title
Relating to training and education for state agency administrators and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 3337Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Salaries & Expenses
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Salaries & Expenses
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees