TX HB3334 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to satisfaction of continuing education requirements for certain insurance adjusters.
Title
Relating to satisfaction of continuing education requirements for certain insurance adjusters.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#736 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#736 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1584 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Insurance
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Insurance
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions