TX HB3329 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to funds promoting economic development.
Title
Relating to funds promoting economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
EMERGING TECHNOLOGY ADVISORY COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Governor
Science & Technology
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND BOARD
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
EMERGING TECHNOLOGY ADVISORY COMMITTEE, TEXAS
Governor
Science & Technology
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND BOARD