TX HB3327 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the acquisition of real property for a proposed oil and gas pipeline through eminent domain by a common carrier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the acquisition of real property for a proposed oil and gas pipeline through eminent domain by a common carrier.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback