TX HB3327 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a list of mental health, substance abuse, and suicide prevention programs that may be selected for implementation by public schools.
Title
Relating to a list of mental health, substance abuse, and suicide prevention programs that may be selected for implementation by public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] |
Rep. John Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - HB 3327Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
SUICIDE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
SUICIDE