TX HB3325 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the payment of certain costs associated with certain educational programs of Prairie View A&M University.
Title
Relating to the payment of certain costs associated with certain educational programs of Prairie View A&M University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | |
2011-05-04 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3325 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03325I.htm |