TX HB3324 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a grocery access investment fund program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a grocery access investment fund program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Rep. Tomas Uresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-04-10 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
FOOD
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
FOOD
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs