TX HB3323 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation of and improvements to the quality of the Texas Workforce Commission's subsidized child care program.
Title
Relating to the evaluation of and improvements to the quality of the Texas Workforce Commission's subsidized child care program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#675 (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Day Care
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS