TX HB3318 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships, alternatives to guardianship, and supports and services for incapacitated persons.
Title
Relating to guardianships, alternatives to guardianship, and supports and services for incapacitated persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1129 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1129 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1129 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts