TX HB3303 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedure for making any change from any voting standard, practice, or procedure authorized by the Election Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedure for making any change from any voting standard, practice, or procedure authorized by the Election Code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1765 (Similar To) 2021-03-26 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1765 (Similar To) 2021-03-26 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback