TX HB3284 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prescribing and dispensing controlled substances and monitoring the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; providing for administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescribing and dispensing controlled substances and monitoring the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; providing for administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1261 (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1261
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback