TX HB3276 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice of health benefit plan provider network status provided by certain freestanding emergency medical care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice of health benefit plan provider network status provided by certain freestanding emergency medical care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#641 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenatePassed
2017-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-03-28HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback