TX HB3267 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to participation in and contributions to the optional retirement program for certain employees of institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to participation in and contributions to the optional retirement program for certain employees of institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Teachers
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Teachers