TX HB3266 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees charged to students enrolled at component institutions of The Texas A&M University System.
Title
Relating to fees charged to students enrolled at component institutions of The Texas A&M University System.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1241 (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1168 (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1168 (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1241 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1168 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM