TX HB3264 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment by the Texas Workforce Commission of a workplace soft skills training pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment by the Texas Workforce Commission of a workplace soft skills training pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback