TX HB3258 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 7/4/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 7/4/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an authorization to increase the sales and use tax collected in an advanced transportation district of a metropolitan rapid transit authority.
Title
Relating to an authorization to increase the sales and use tax collected in an advanced transportation district of a metropolitan rapid transit authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 7/4/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-02 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-02 | House | Postponed 5/2/19 4:00 PM |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1475 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous