TX HB3257 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal consequences of using or exhibiting an imitation firearm.
Title
Relating to the criminal consequences of using or exhibiting an imitation firearm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3257 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03257I.htm |