TX HB3252 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to designating October 17 as Entrepreneurs with Disabilities Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to designating October 17 as Entrepreneurs with Disabilities Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3252
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03252I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03252H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03252E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03252S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03252I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03252H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03252H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03252E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03252E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03252S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03252S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3252&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback