TX HB3248 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the medical authorization required to release protected health information in a health care liability claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the medical authorization required to release protected health information in a health care liability claim.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-05-10HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 1565
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-03HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-03HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1565 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback