TX HB3246 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information on projected changes in weather, water availability, and climate variability in strategic plans of certain state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information on projected changes in weather, water availability, and climate variability in strategic plans of certain state agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB306 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB1949 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2017 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4178 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback