TX HB3246 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the treatment and recycling for beneficial use of certain waste arising out of or incidental to the drilling for or production of oil or gas.
Title
Relating to the treatment and recycling for beneficial use of certain waste arising out of or incidental to the drilling for or production of oil or gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#403 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#403 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-24 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#403 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |