TX HB3242 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of the surviving spouse of an elderly person who qualified for a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a taxing unit of a portion of the appraised value of the deceased person's residence homestead to continue to receive an exemption for the same property from the same taxing unit in an amount equal to that of the exemption for which the deceased person qualified without applying for the exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of the surviving spouse of an elderly person who qualified for a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation by a taxing unit of a portion of the appraised value of the deceased person's residence homestead to continue to receive an exemption for the same property from the same taxing unit in an amount equal to that of the exemption for which the deceased person qualified without applying for the exemption.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-06HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2023-05-06HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2023-05-06HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-24HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-24HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2023-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-15HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2023-03-15HouseRead first time
2023-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1381 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective on 1/1/24
SB1381 (Same As) 2023-05-27 - Effective on 1/1/24

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback