TX HB3238 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic Medicaid recipient directories maintained by Medicaid managed care organizations.
Title
Relating to the electronic Medicaid recipient directories maintained by Medicaid managed care organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1829 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID