TX HB3236 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the costs associated with the provision of certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials.
Title
Relating to the costs associated with the provision of certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1243 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1203 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Motion prevails RV#1202 (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1203 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Motion prevails RV#1202 (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion prevails |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion for the previous question |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS