TX HB323 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a law enforcement agency accreditation grant program.
Title
Relating to a law enforcement agency accreditation grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Amended RV#591 (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#591 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-04-30 | House | Amended 1-P. King |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Gervin-Hawkins |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |